SIBSON'S SCHOOL, PLUMBLAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
grant for further education to children whom reside in Plumbland and whom attended Plumbland school. grants for the school to purchase educational material.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 13 April 1987: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Cox | Chair | 21 June 2010 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Stephen John Banks | Trustee | 28 July 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Norman Eilbeck | Trustee | 21 June 2010 |
|
|
||||||||
Alan Leslie Mounsey | Trustee | 21 June 2010 |
|
|
||||||||
Alexander George Watson | Trustee | 21 June 2010 |
|
|
||||||||
RICHARD MILLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £839 | £838 | £832 | £821 | £842 | |
|
Total expenditure | £650 | £650 | £700 | £835 | £1.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 25 SEPTEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
A. THE PROVISION OF SPECIAL BENEFITS AT THE SCHOOL OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY AS MAY BE AGREED BETWEEN THE TRUSTEES AND GOVERNORS OF THE SCHOOL. B. THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION, INCLUDING RELIGIOUS EDUCATION CONSISTENT WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OR PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE ATTENDING OR HAVE AT ANYTIME ATTENDED THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
PLUMBLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Looking Stead
Plumbland
Aspatria
Wigton
CA7 2ET
- Phone:
- 01697321906
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window