ADHD LIBERTY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise awareness of Adult ADHD and campaign for mandatory ADHD screening throughout the Criminal Justice System, Addiction and Homeless services in the UK. To actively promote ADHD training for Teachers. For ADHD screening to be mandatory from the age of five, and at every transition, in UK schools. Campaigning to stop the School-to-Prison Pipeline.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgia Clare Miller | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Khaled Mostafa Ibrahim Helmy | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Mary Bullimore | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Holloway | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Liveston | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sean McNicholas | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Elizabeth Harvey-Bryn | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lamin Dibba | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jennifer Templeton | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.03k | £24.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.66k | £7.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 09 March 2025 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | 09 March 2025 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 01 May 2024 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | 01 May 2024 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF THOSE WITH ADHD (ATTENTION DEFICIT HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER) BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO THEM, THEIR FAMILIES AND THOSE CARING AND SUPPORTING THEM IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO RECEIVE SERVICES SUCH AS PROFESSIONAL ASSESSMENT, DIAGNOSIS, MEDICATION AND FOLLOW-ON PSYCHIATRIC SUPPORT
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Jumelle Mews
HIGH WYCOMBE
Buckinghamshire
HP13 5BU
- Phone:
- 07769355003
- Email:
- sarah@adhdliberty.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window