SUSTAINABLE HAYFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sustainable Hayfield works with individuals & community organisations to promote sustainability in the parish of Hayfield. We have 5 working groups - energy, transport, food, waste (3Rs), and biodiversity. These groups run projects locally. We produce a quarterly newsletter for our 200 supporters and organise an annual Apple Day. We engage with local councils and our MP on environmental matters,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 July 2024
Total income includes £52 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 16 March 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Mary Moss | Chair | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Harry Cliffe | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mary Scott | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Rose Roberts | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Alan James | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Derek Alan Clarke | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
DR PENELOPE ANNE ROBERTS | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Rachel Hanney | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/07/2023 | 30/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.91k | £4.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.84k | £3.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £800 | £52 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 July 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 July 2023 | 05 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2023 | 05 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT* FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PARISH OF HAYFIELD AND SURROUNDING AREA BY: (A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; (B) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC WELLBEING AND REGENERATION; (C) THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT. *SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS "SOCIAL, ECONOMIC AND ENVIRONMENTAL DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS."
Contact information
- Address:
-
15B Church Street
Hayfield
High Peak
SK22 2JE
- Phone:
- 07749710127
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window