RAJ KAUSHAL GITA BHAWAN HINDU TEMPLE MANCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A) advancing the Hindu religion and doctrines; B) advancing education in Hindu traditions, history, language, literature, and music; and C) providing relief to persons who are in conditions of need, hardship, distress or are sick.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
Governance
- 17 December 2021: CIO registration
- RKGBHTM-CIO (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAJ KAUSHAL | Chair | 17 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Anjla Rawal | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr GIRDARI LAL BHAN | Trustee | 17 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr NAWAL KANT PRINJA | Trustee | 17 December 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.15k | £149.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.86k | £166.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 21 March 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 15 April 2024 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
3.1THE CIO WILL PROMOTE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WITHIN THE MANCHESTER AREA WITH THE OBJECT OF: A)ADVANCING THE HINDU RELIGION AND DOCTRINES; B)ADVANCING EDUCATION IN HINDU TRADITIONS, HISTORY, LANGUAGE, LITERATURE, AND MUSIC; AND C)PROVIDING RELIEF TO PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP, DISTRESS OR ARE SICK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GITA BHAVAN HINDU TEMPLE
231 WITHINGTON ROAD
MANCHESTER
M16 8LU
- Phone:
- 07885486509
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window