LONDON WARRIORS AMERICAN FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The UK's leading American football club for boys and girls from 7 years old based in South London. Established in 2005 to allow young people to continue to play football, stay off the streets and offer an alternative family to the gangs that many were at risk of, or had previously been part of. Our 7 teams provide for 300 participants every year. Over 3500 young people have been involved since.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 26 October 2021: Standard registration
- LWAFC OR LONDON WARRIORS AFC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucille Stewart | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Loprimo | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Glendon Fendley | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vernon Kay | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marvin Allen | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.65k | £67.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.59k | £69.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES 22 SEP 2020 22 SEP 2020 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CLUB IS ESTABLISHED ARE: A) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAYING AMERICAN FOOTBALL, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF ORGANISED AMERICAN FOOTBALL TRAINING, FITNESS AND TEAMWORK SESSIONS AND GAMES AND TUITION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS (FACILITIES MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); B) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE DIRECTORS THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
London Warriors American Football Club
124 City Road
London
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- 07920527218
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window