Accounts and annual returns THE DEAN GIBSON SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 518730
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 16 October 2024 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 February 2021 230 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required