HEP HORIZONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Horizons works to create game changing opportunities for children and young people across Haringey and Enfield. We know support across a range of areas can change the direction of a child's life and we focus on five pathways - creative arts, sports, technology, academic support and experiences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Enfield
- Haringey
Governance
- 24 February 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Page | Chair | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tony Hartney | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Oswald Cozier | Trustee | 02 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Resham Mirza | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|||||
VALERIE HANNON | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £363.74k | £64.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £302.17k | £61.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 15 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 15 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY THOSE FROM DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES OR CIRCUMSTANCES INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION BY A) PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT SUCH THAT THEY HAVE EQUAL ACCESS TO THE SAME EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES AS THOSE FROM MORE ADVANTAGED BACKGROUNDS, AND B) PROVIDING SUPPORT TO INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF SUCH PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HEP Horizons
HEP (Hornsey School for Girls)
Inderwick Road
London
N8 9JF
- Phone:
- 02039675000
- Website:
-
horizonscharity.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window