RAMSEY PAVILION HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Hub will provide all sectors of the community with an affordable, locally accessible place for community & sporting activities with a variety of sports, events, meetings & functions available in a high quality, pleasant & welcoming space. Activities available include cricket, football, drop-in space for all ages, provision of children's activities, bookable space for community & private hire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 23 February 2022: CIO registration
- RAMSEY PAVILION HUB CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Peter Axelsen | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wallace Jardine Coles | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JAMES HODGSON | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|||||
ANNE WELLS | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JAMES BUDDLE | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £12.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £11.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 03 April 2025 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 03 April 2025 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Feb 2022 as amended on 28 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF RAMSEY, CAMBRIDGESHIRE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. (2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF RAMSEY, CAMBRIDGESHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ramsey Pavilion Hub
Cricketfield Lane
Ramsey
HUNTINGDON
Cambridgeshire
PE26 1BG
- Phone:
- 01487814897
- Email:
- office@ramseypavilion.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window