JAMIA GHOSIA ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY PROVIDES A PLACE OF WORSHIP TO HUNDREDS OF PEOPLE. FACILITIES ARE PROVIDED FOR ISLAMIC AND QURANIC STUDIES FOR ALL AGE GROUPS. THE TRUSTEES MANAGE THE CHARITY ON A VOLUNTEER BASIS AND DUTIES ARE ALLOCATED TO EACH ON A ROTA BASIS. THE MAIN CONGREGATION TAKES PLACE EVERY FRIDAY WITH THE ATTENDANCE OF APPROXIMATELY 400 WORSHIPERS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Blackburn With Darwen
Governance
- 28 April 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIR ZAMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Shazad Ali | Trustee | 22 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sabir Hussain | Trustee | 22 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
RAJA SADDAR IQBAL | Trustee | 22 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Iftikhar Ahmed | Trustee | 22 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bashir Ahmed | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ASIF IQBAL | Trustee | 01 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED NASIR | Trustee | 01 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED SADIQ | Trustee |
|
||||||
AJAIB HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABDUL HAMID | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.27k | £160.21k | £226.85k | £193.04k | £228.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.89k | £93.64k | £97.51k | £100.38k | £112.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 29 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 04 April 2024 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 27 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 27 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 FEBRUARY 1987
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC FAITH AS PRACTISED BY THE SUNNI MUSLIM SECT IN BLACKBURN AND ITS ENVIRONS AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SUFFERING AMONG MEMBERS OF THE SECT IN THE SAID DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
BLACKBURN AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
98
Chester Street
BLACKBURN
BB1 1DW
- Phone:
- 01254 51080
- Email:
- info@jamiaghosiamosque.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window