Financial history WHITLAND MEMORIAL INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 518760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.56k £11.41k £5.79k £14.39k £13.43k
Total expenditure £5.87k £2.95k £4.64k £12.46k £6.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £4.91k N/A