Accounts and annual returns HARMONIA HOUSING

Charity number: 1197403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 May 2024 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 28 May 2024 118 days late Download Open in new window