BETHANY COMMUNITY CHURCHES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Stockport
Governance
- 24 April 1987: Standard registration
- 06 October 2014: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 06 October 2014: Funds transferred to 251549 ELIM FOURSQUARE GOSPEL ALLIANCE
- GATLEY CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £136.23k | £122.42k | £127.70k | £96.82k | £100.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £134.54k | £144.65k | £142.49k | £125.97k | £160.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 15 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 15 July 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 22 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 22 July 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 18 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 18 July 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 08 June 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 08 June 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 MARCH 1987
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCODANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND THE WORSHIP OF GOD IN THE SAID COUNTY AND ELSEWHERE BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER INCLUDING (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL AND THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES AND PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND THE PRINTING AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE BIBLE AND CHRISTIAN LITERATURE. (2) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK. (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSES 1-3 OF THE 1ST SCHEDULE OF THE DECLARATION OF TRUST).
Area of benefit
GREATER MANCHESTER
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window