Accounts and annual returns TYNESIDE KIDNEY PATIENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 518767
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 02 April 2025 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 24 March 2025 358 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 08 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 14 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 11 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required