CHURCH ON THE WAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the church is to advance the Christian faith. This is done through weekly Sunday services with a strong emphasis on Christian worship and the teaching of the bible, with meetings at the same time for children and young people. During the week we also run bible studies, prayer meetings, children's groups and mum and toddler gatherings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 26 October 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel John Topham | Chair | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Barlow | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Thomas Tyson Cooper | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Brook | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clifford King | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Townend | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jake Alistair Hutton | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frank James Barnes | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Michael Chadwick | Trustee | 26 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £161.84k | £135.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.85k | £125.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN BRADFORD, WEST YORKSHIRE AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH ON THE WAY
156 BRADFORD ROAD
IDLE
BRADFORD
BD10 8SA
- Phone:
- 01274617737
- Email:
- info@cotw.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.