LIGHT OF THE WORLD MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(1) the prevention or relief of poverty in east London or the world as the trustees of the charity may from time to time think fit by providing: items and services to individuals in need and/or charities, or other organisations working to prevent or relieve poverty. (2) to advance the Christian faith in such parts of east London or the world as the trustees may from time to time think fit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Waltham Forest
- Nigeria
- Philippines
Governance
- 10 December 2021: CIO registration
- PRAYER WIDOWS PROJECT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gary Lee Glasgow | Chair | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shiv Ranjan Banerjee | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geneisha Francessca Glasgow | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Samantha Campbell | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.91k | £20.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.08k | £24.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 January 2025 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 January 2025 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 January 2025 | 449 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 January 2025 | 449 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
(1) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN EAST LONDON OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT BY PROVIDING: ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. (2) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN SUCH PARTS OF EAST LONDON OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Mill Houses
27 Mill Lane
WOODFORD GREEN
Essex
IG8 0UL
- Phone:
- 07984000305
- Email:
- info@lightoftheworld.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window