LIVING IT UP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Living It Up is committed to offering a range of empowering and skill-building services for people who have a learning disability and/or autism. We have a range of services and are continuing to develop services to enable people to have similar opportunities to others, to reduce social isolation and offer further opportunities that enhance life and can develop skills. We are based in Bedfordshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £204,363 from 2 government contract(s) and £14,235 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
57 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 31 May 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Collett | Chair | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oli Monks | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Neyland | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gareth James Wright | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Margaret Airs | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £401.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £314.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £204.36k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.24k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG VULNERABLE ADULTS AND CHILDREN, WITH A PHYSICAL OR LEARNING DISABILITY OR AUTISM WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR DISABILITY, BY PROVIDING: 1. OPPORTUNITIES TO LEARN NEW SKILLS, EDUCATION AND TRAINING THAT ARE DESIGNED TO ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY; 2. SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND EVENTS INVOLVING THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. CUTHBERTS HALL
NEWNHAM STREET
BEDFORD
MK40 3JR
- Phone:
- 07964067443
- Email:
- info@lovelivingitup.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window