Accounts and annual returns DEVON ESSENTIAL MEDICAL SERVICES & SOUTHERN EVENT SOLUTIONS CIO

Charity Number: 1197624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 08 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 22 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 February 2024 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 14 February 2024 14 days late Download Open in new window