Accounts and annual returns THE WAREHOUSE MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1197000
Charity reporting is up to date (193 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 21 September 2023 20 December 2024 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 21 September 2023 30 January 2025 193 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 21 September 2022 21 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 21 September 2022 12 December 2024 510 days late Download Open in new window