Wyke Christian Community Church

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for local, national and international Christian organisations Provision of youth development activities Provision of local community facilities and services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,738 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bradford City
Governance
- 24 April 1987: Standard registration
- WYKE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Ann Atkinson | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kane Peter Atkinson | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gladys Wilson | Trustee | 08 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Amanda Burston | Trustee | 30 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Heather Jean Moon | Trustee | 30 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT MOON | Trustee | 11 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER DURAND SHANE BURSTON | Trustee | 11 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.01k | £43.27k | £47.77k | £60.39k | £68.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.66k | £37.40k | £39.51k | £45.56k | £55.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.63k | £2.74k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPED 16 APRIL 1987 as amended on 25 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 1 THE ESTABLISHMENT OF CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP MEETINGS. 2 THE ESTABLISHMENT OF TEACHING CLASSES AND THE DISTRIBUTION OF TRAINING MATERIAL. 3 THE SUPPORT OF INTERNATIONAL CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES AND MISSIONS. 4 THE PROMOTION OF CHRISTIAN EVANGELISTIC OUT REACH CAMPAIGNS. 5 THE PRODUCTION OF CHRISTIAN MUSICAL AND DRAMATIC WORKS AND THE DISTRIBUTION OF CHRISTIAN MUSIC AND DRAMTIC MATERIAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wyke Christian Community Church
Town Gate
Wyke
BRADFORD
BD12 9JP
- Phone:
- 07356221025
- Email:
- wykeccc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window