Accounts and annual returns CORBEILLE BLANCHE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1196001
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 17 September 2024 11 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 17 September 2024 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 17 September 2023 14 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 17 September 2023 11 March 2025 237 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 17 September 2022 09 October 2023 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 17 September 2022 09 October 2023 84 days late Download Open in new window