The Llanelli Grammar School Old Boys and Graig Former Pupils Association

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charity activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 06 May 1987: Standard registration
- LLANELLI GRAMMAR SCHOOL OLD BOYS UNION AND CRAIG FORMER PUPILS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- GRAIG FORMER PUPILS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- LLANELLI GRAMMAR SCHOOL OLD BOYS' UNION AND GRAIG FORMER PUPILS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Kenneth Board | Chair | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Hywel Bonnell Houghton-Jones | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|||||
David Hugh Marshall | Trustee | 14 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ralph Paul Oram | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
George Parker | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Peter Lane | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.72k | £1.35k | £1.53k | £3.60k | £2.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.02k | £1.40k | £2.28k | £4.10k | £3.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 03 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 FEBRUARY 1987 AS AMENDED 14 SEPTEMBER 1993, AND AMENDED 23 SEPTEMBER 1997. as amended on 01 Dec 2020 as amended on 01 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF FORMER PUPILS OF LLANELLI BOYS GRAMMAR SCHOOL AND GRAIG COMPREHENSIVE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING GRANTS OR SCHOLARSHIPS TO ENABLE THEM TO UNDERTAKE TRAINING THAT THEY COULD NOT NORMALLY PROVIDE THEMSELVES; AND B) THE RELIEF OF PAST PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Parker Brothers Contractors Ltd
29 Glyncoed Terrace
LLANELLI
Carmarthenshire
SA15 1HQ
- Phone:
- 07885222088
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window