TIDWORTH TOWN FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities carried out by Tidworth Town Football Club are providing a safe and secure place for all to play football at a grassroots level.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 10 January 2022: CIO registration
- TIDWORTH TOWN FC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher James Chapman ACMA CGMA | Chair | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Bethell | Trustee | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Lane | Trustee | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Stringer | Trustee | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.88k | £36.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.83k | £37.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.65k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 29 August 2024 | 151 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 29 August 2024 | 151 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN WILTSHIRE BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO PLAY FOOTBALL AND THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT AND SUPPORT TO GROUPS AROUND THE WORLD TO ENABLE THE BENEFICIARIES TO PARTICIPATE IN FOOTBALL. (FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE “FACILITIES” MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT, ACCESS TO COACHING AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tidworth Town FC
Humber Lane
Tidworth
Wiltshire
SP97AH
- Phone:
- 07515809550
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window