HECKINGTON VILLAGE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Renovation of Station Buildings and running of Railway and Heritage Museum. Keeping of local archives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 13 May 1987: Standard registration
- 05 December 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.39k | £909 | £2.33k | £2.48k | £1.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £930 | £1.08k | £2.29k | £3.80k | £1.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 09 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 16 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 MARCH 1980.
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCTION BY SECURING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMTN OF FEATRUES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTERES IN THE AREA COMPRISING HECKINGTON WITH HOWELL (ECCLESIASTICAL) IN THE COUNTY OF LINCOLNSHIRE WHICH AREA SHALL HEREINAFTER BE REFERRED TO AS "THE AREA OF BENEFIT" AND IN PARTICULAR TO ACQUIRE AND PRESERVE THE BUILDING KNOWN OR FORMERLY KNOW AS THE OLD PEA WAREHOUSE, HECKINGTON AS A CRAFT AND EXHIBTION CENTRE. 2. TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND IN CRAFTS OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST AND IN THE ARTS. 3. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERETS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT; AND TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
HECKINGTON WITH HOWELL IN THE COUNTY OF LINCOLNSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window