QUEENSCOURT HOSPICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide specialist palliative care free of charge to adults with a serious and life limiting illness. To promote the practice of palliative care by example and by teaching and training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£6,229,064
Donations and legacies | £2.42m | |
Charitable activities | £2.43m | |
Other trading activities | £1.09m | |
Investments | £280.37k | |
Other | £1.80k |
Total expenditure:
£7,028,557
Raising funds | £1.03m | |
Charitable activities | £6.00m | |
Other | £0 |
£258,856 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £332,112 from 2 government contract(s) and £695,712 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.03m | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.00m |
People

169 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
362 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 11 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 2 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
- Sefton
Governance
- 04 June 1987: Standard registration
- 01 May 2019: Funds received from 235460 SOUTHPORT RELIEF SOCIETY
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Damian Crewe | Chair | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Valaina Bowker | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sharryn Gardner | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hilary McLaren | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roseanna Ingham | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Causer | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Terry McGraw | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqui Campbell | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Kemp | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Hooton | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kim Bartrum Wallis | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev PETER MARTIN ABRAMS | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Geraldine Rose Boocock | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Carol Bernard | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Paul Cutner | Trustee | 26 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.98m | £5.94m | £5.55m | £5.78m | £6.23m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.05m | £5.60m | £5.57m | £6.53m | £7.03m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £867.86k | £821.08k | £319.03k | £319.03k | £332.11k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £330.74k | £848.61k | £670.62k | £695.71k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.39m | £1.66m | £1.90m | £2.24m | £2.42m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.12m | £804.95k | £937.64k | £1.01m | £1.09m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.16m | £2.03m | £2.12m | £2.25m | £2.43m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £314.52k | £274.08k | £254.98k | £266.83k | £280.37k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £1.17m | £328.42k | £9.70k | £1.80k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £413.51k | £552.99k | £1.03m | £1.21m | £1.12m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.18m | £4.80m | £4.76m | £5.63m | £6.00m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £862.12k | £798.19k | £812.83k | £906.94k | £1.03m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £49.32k | £61.01k | £56.77k | £14.00k | £191.31k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £5.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.69m | £3.63m | £3.47m | £3.25m | £3.11m | |
|
Long-term investments | £6.92m | £7.89m | £7.88m | £7.55m | £6.71m | |
|
Other assets | £1.55m | £1.74m | £2.63m | £2.69m | £2.69m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £793.29k | £395.06k | £437.72k | £1.15m | £709.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 FEBRUARY 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 1 SEPTEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 SEPTEMBER 2002 as amended on 19 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CARE OF, PROVIDE CARE AND SERVICES TO, GIBE SYMPTOM CONTROL TO AND FOR, AND ORGANISE AND PROVIDE CONTINUING AND TERMINAL CARE SERVICES TO ALL PERSONS WITH CANCER OR ANY OTHER DISEASE, WHERE IT IS FELT THAT A CURE IS NO LONGER POSSIBLE AND FOR WHOM ONLY PALLIATIVE TREATMENT IS AVAILABLE AND PROVIDE SUCH SERVICES TO ALL PERSONS SUFFERING FROM INTRACTABLE PAIN, SO FAR AS THIS CAN BE DONE WITHOUT DETRIMENT TO THOSE SUFFERING FROM TERMINAL ILLNESS AND TO ESTABLISH AND OPERATE A CENTRE FOR SUCH PERSONS. (FOR FURTHER OBJECTS SEE MEMORANDUM)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
QUEENSCOURT HOSPICE
TOWN LANE
SOUTHPORT
PR8 6RE
- Phone:
- 01704517926
- Email:
- hospice@queenscourt.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window