NDOKWA ASSOCIATION UK CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing practical help, advice and support to elderly, disabled and disadvantaged people of Ndokwa Origin living anywhere in the world. Promote racial harmony for the benefit of the public, by educating the general public about Ukwuani language, other languages of Ndokwaland and Ukwuani history, culture and values. To establish or secure a community centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 27 April 2022: CIO registration
- NAUK CIO (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gabriel Onwubolu | Chair | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Folashade Esther Adoh | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tonnie Omegbe Adoh | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
FRANCIS ENEBELI | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Walter Santos | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stella Amogbokpa | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Opakunle | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Esy Oluwafemi | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168 | £7.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £4.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 01 April 2024 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 01 April 2024 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) THE RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS IN WAYS THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING PRACTICAL HELP, ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO ELDERLY, DISABLED AND DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE OF NDOKWA ORIGIN LIVING ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD. (2) THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, BY EDUCATING THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT UKWUANI LANGUAGE, OTHER LANGUAGES OF NDOKWALAND AND UKWUANI HISTORY, CULTURE AND VALUES, SO AS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS. (3) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING COUNTIES, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
102 Roding Lane North
Woodford Green
Essex
IG8 8LJ
- Phone:
- 07810883849
- Email:
- enebeli@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window