CYCLING TYNEDALE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity promotes cycling for the public benefit in and around Tynedale.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northumberland
Governance
- 26 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rob Aubrook | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Aubrook | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Swabey | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Patton | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.60k | £1.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.19k | £4.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 26 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO PROMOTE CYCLING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN AND AROUND TYNEDALE AS A MEANS OF FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES: (1) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC HEALTH. (2) THE PROMOTION OF THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT. (3) THE PROMOTION OF CYCLING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY PROMOTING, ASSISTING, FACILITATING, AND PROTECTING THE USE OF BICYCLES AND SIMILAR VEHICLES ON PUBLIC ROADS AND PUBLICLY ACCESSIBLE ROUTES. (4) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY, PARTICULARLY ON THE HIGHWAYS. (5) THE PROMOTION OF HEALTHY RECREATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LYNNHURST
ELVASTON DRIVE
HEXHAM
NORTHUMBERLAND
NE46 2HS
- Phone:
- 07871383456
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window