Trustees SHEFFIELD OPEN HEART CLUB

Charity Number: 518812
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUSAN INGLIS Chair
None on record
Peter Bates Trustee 09 October 2024
None on record
Eric Job Trustee 16 October 2023
None on record
Michael Bray Trustee 06 October 2021
None on record
Harry Watson Trustee 06 October 2021
None on record
James Patrick Whyte Trustee 05 June 2019
None on record
Ian Prior Trustee 06 March 2019
None on record
RODNEY GODBER BSc DLC Trustee 06 September 2017
None on record
JOHN CLARKE Trustee
None on record
SALLY ANN HUCKLE Trustee
None on record
ANTHONY MALLINDER Trustee
None on record