CYLCH Y COED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cylch y Coed is a Welsh medium, not for profit pre-school play group based in Cyncoed, north Cardiff. The aim of Cylch Y Coed is to provide children in North-East Cardiff with the opportunity to benefit from Early Years education and experiences through the medium of Welsh in a happy, safe and friendly environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cardiff
Governance
- 05 October 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophie Morgan | Chair | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Luke Bowler | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Margaret Hall | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emily Laxton | Trustee | 18 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Prosser | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 324 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 324 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN IN THE NORTH EAST CARDIFF THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF THE WELSH LANGUAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cylch y Coed
CYNCOED METHODIST CHURCH
WESTMINSTER CRESCENT
CAERDYDD
CF23 6SE
- Phone:
- 07814174933
- Email:
- cylchycoed@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window