LIVVY LOU'S LOVED ONES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising funds through activities/sponsorship to help disabled children and their families
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marc Paul Coleman | Chair | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
SIOBHAN COLEMAN | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
SAMUEL JOHN NICHOLAS | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PAUL ROSE | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.91k | £22.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.06k | £8.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 March 2025 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 March 2025 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 February 2025 | 391 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 February 2025 | 391 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN IN NEED IN ENGLAND BY REASON OF MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISABILITY OR ILLNESS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS THROUGH THE AWARD OF GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO PROVIDE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THERAPY SESSIONS, ESSENTIAL EQUIPMENT, DAYS OUT AND RESPITE HOLIDAYS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Basings
Westerham Road
KESTON
Kent
BR2 6HH
- Phone:
- 07734994835
- Email:
- team@livvylous.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window