Trustees SANDWICH BAY BIRD OBSERVATORY TRUST
Charity number: 1197743

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian David Hunter | Chair | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary Thomas Edward Stewart | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elinor Kaye Draper | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Arthur Searle | Trustee | 31 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER PAULINE ALICE JUPE | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Anthony Rackliffe | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ivan Macey | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Hunter | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Guy Vincent de Rose | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Witty | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Allen Crombet-Beolens | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Russell Thompson | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Henry Poole | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Weaving | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
EUGENE PETER HOOD | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.