THE DANDO CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY ARE TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pearl Elizabeth Mary Dando | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||
GRAHAM JOHN SHEPPARD | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|||||||
ANDREW PAUL CLEVERLY | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 281 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 647 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE ELDERLY PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED, BY REASON OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS, DISABILITY AND/OR POOR HEALTH, BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT TOWARDS, OR FOR THE PROVISION OF, SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED HOUSING, AND ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Birch Grove
Henllys
CWMBRAN
Gwent
NP44 6EP
- Phone:
- 07930 801113
- Email:
- pastor@bethelnewport.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window