MARGATE CREATIVE LAND TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The role of the Trust in Margate is ensuring that creative space and programming is inclusive and supports underserved communities to access opportunities within the creative industries of leadership, jobs, training and enterprise development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 12 April 2022: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paula Hirst | Chair | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
GABRIELLE SUZANNNE WILSON | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
DR MICHAEL BARRY NATES | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Hannah Cooper-Davis | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Edgar Hendy Chilcott | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Peter Crook | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jane Middlehurst | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sanjivan Kohli | Trustee | 19 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.65m | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.75k | £279.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.65m | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £500 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £6.65m | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £87.75k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £14.50k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 NOV 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO PROMOTE ARTS, CRAFTS AND CRAFTSMANSHIP FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING OR FACILITATING ACCESS TO AFFORDABLE WORKSPACE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF ARTS AND CRAFTS TO THOSE IN NEED IN THE DISTRICT OF THANET IN THE COUNTY OF KENT AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kent Innovation Centre
Millennium Way
Thanet Reach Business Park
BROADSTAIRS
Kent
CT10 2QQ
- Phone:
- 01843577000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window