BRIXHAM BOWLING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We promote of community participation in healthy recreation for the benefit of the inhabitants of Torbay and the South Devon area by the provision of facilities for playing bowls.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £524 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Torbay
Governance
- 20 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Steele | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edwin Pocock | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Cornish | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary Edwards | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Cann | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Harris | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Edwards | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jean Tully | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Moore | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID TAYLOR | Trustee | 06 November 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.21k | £19.36k | £22.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.59k | £21.48k | £22.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.67k | N/A | £524 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 16 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Dec 2021 as amended on 04 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF TORBAY AND THE SOUTH DEVON AREA BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING BOWLS (FACILITIES MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES).
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Pavilion
Nelson Road
Brixham
TQ5 8BH
- Phone:
- 01803852118
- Email:
- brixhambowlingclub@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window