LEICESTER COMMUNITY CONCERT BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Leicester Community Concert Band (LCCB) was established in 2007 and is now one of the largest amateur wind ensembles in Leicestershire. The band performs a varied repertoire, with something to suit everyone's taste, and strives to provide a friendly and supportive environment within which all musicians can progress at their own rate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Leicester City
Governance
- 05 October 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Stuart Robinson | Chair | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Raymond Lee | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Briggs | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deirdre Anne Lehan-Matthews | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward James Matthews | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Highton | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Dexter | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Churcher | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.45k | £13.79k | £14.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.20k | £11.82k | £12.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 MAR 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE: 1. TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS; 2. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES WHICH PROMOTE THE PRACTICE OR ENJOYMENT OF THE ART OF MUSIC FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION AND TO MAKE THEM AVAILABLE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 THE YEWS
OADBY
LEICESTER
LE2 5EF
- Phone:
- 07979943891
- Email:
- info@lccb.org.uk
- Website:
-
leicestercommunityconcertband.weebly.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window