LENOIR FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit, to promote and improve education in digital skills by providing training, grants, items and services to individuals and/or charities, or other organisations working to improve digital skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Mawaka | Chair | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Chardelle Lennard | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ionut Iulian Ungureanu | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janice Muradzikwa | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/12/2022 | 01/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.01k | £321 | |
|
Total expenditure | £397 | £1.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2023 | 19 October 2024 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE AND IMPROVE EDUCATION IN DIGITAL SKILLS BY PROVIDING TRAINING, GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO IMPROVE DIGITAL SKILLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lenoir Foundation
3rd Floor
86-90 Paul Street
LONDON
EC2A 4NE
- Phone:
- 07856526631
- Email:
- jamesmakawa@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window