ST BUDEAUX CHRISTIAN EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This new charity builds on St Budeaux Schools Foundation Trust to advance 1)the Christian education of pupils at St Budeaux Foundation School 2) the Christian Religion for the benefit of the public in accordance with the doctrines of the Church of England 3) the education (including social, moral, physical) of people under 25 in the parish of St Budeaux and surrounding area as the trustees see fit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 17 January 2022: CIO registration
- 10 July 2024: Funds received from 1140886 ST BUDEAUX SCHOOLS FOUNDATION TRUST
- ST BUDEAUX FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LOUIS NEALE | Chair | 17 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Alison Waiford | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MANNERS | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Jane Phillipa Neale | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Derek Tyrrell | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Andrew Baul | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA LOUISE JEWITT | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £27.85k | £31.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £4.23k | £30.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT ST. BUDEAUX FOUNDATION SCHOOL. 2. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND. 3. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL MORAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 IN THE PARISH OF ST. BUDEAUX AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO (1) PROVIDING MATERIALS AND EQUIPMENT AND DISCRETIONARY FUNDING AND GRANTS TO EDUCATION ESTABLISHMENTS TO ASSIST THEM IN PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING TEACHING FACILITIES AND RESOURCES, (2) AWARDING TO SUCH YOUNG PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TO ENABLE THEM TO FUND THEIR PRIMARY OR SECONDARY OR TERTIARY EDUCATION AND SUSTAIN THEMSELVES IN FURTHERANCE OF SUCH EDUCATION AND (3) TO ASSIST IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT ANY OTHER CHARITY OPERATING IN THE PARISH OF ST. BUDEAUX AND SURROUNDING AREAS WHOSE AIMS INCLUDE ADVANCING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL MORAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25.
Contact information
- Address:
-
166 TAILYOUR ROAD
PLYMOUTH
PL6 5DJ
- Phone:
- 01752361019
- Email:
- STEPHENBEACH@BTINTERNET.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window