ALBEMARLE PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We carry out fund-raising activities, such as winter and summer fairs, to raise money for Albemarle Primary School. This supports the school to, for example, carry out school trips and to buy equipment to support students' learning.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 27 October 2021: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Irina Pashova | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Standley | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lia Villaruel | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Silvia Marucelli | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth Pearson | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2022 | 30/08/2023 | 30/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £961 | £4.54k | £6.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £721 | £2.23k | £10.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 OCT 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Albemarle Primary School
Princes Way
London
SW19 6JP
- Phone:
- 02087883170
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window