Financial history LEICESTER CHRISTADELPHIAN ECCLESIA

Charity number: 518866
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £15.87k £218.07k £288.53k £14.49k £17.08k
Total expenditure £30.08k £22.98k £474.67k £61.08k £49.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A