LEICESTER CHRISTADELPHIAN ECCLESIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Christian organisation who meet to worship, study the Bible, preach to those not of our faith, run a Sunday School and hold youth activities. Our funds are collected solely from our own members to enable the above plus assist in the welfare of our own members, maintain our building and support other Christadelphian organisations in their work. We also support local hospice charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicester City
Governance
- 28 May 1987: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PR Mallinder | Chair | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard Kirton | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW BRIGGS | Trustee | 20 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
JAMES RICHARD WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN DAVID CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN CYRIL FIDLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.87k | £218.07k | £288.53k | £14.49k | £17.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.08k | £22.98k | £474.67k | £61.08k | £49.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 26 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 26 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 22 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 FEBRUARY 1902 AS AMENDED 5 MARCH 1924, 10 JANUARY 1940, APRIL 1972 FEBRUARY 1976, 26 APRIL 2006 AND 21 APRIL 2010.
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRACTICES OF THE CHRISTADELPHIAN DENOMINATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 GLENHILLS BOULEVARD
LEICESTER
LE2 8UF
- Phone:
- 01162879771
- Email:
- glenhillsecclesia@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window