Trustees THE LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY
Charity number: 518870

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Graham Brown | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
susan valerie wyllie | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Joyce Tyrrell | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mavis Liggins Battell | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Phillpott | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Susan Murphy | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Barker | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Susan Lester | Trustee | 12 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Lovett | Trustee | 12 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.