SOPHOS AFRICA UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SOPHOS AFRICA aims to prevent or relieve poverty in Africa through supporting income generation schemes amongst disadvantaged communities as well as working to address the causes of poverty, such as corruption, religious extremism and enthno-centrism. SOPHOS AFRICA in the UK exists to support and fund the work of Africans to address these issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Eritrea
- Ethiopia
- Kenya
- Nigeria
- Sudan
- Uganda
Governance
- 18 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher William Reveley | Chair | 18 January 2022 |
|
|||||
NICOLA MHAIRI HUNT | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|||||
BRIAN ROBERT MITCHELL | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Guy Michell-Baker | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.10k | £60.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.10k | £48.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN LINE WITH JUDEO-CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES: 1. TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS IN AFRICA, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO: A. SUPPORTING INCOME GENERATION SCHEMES AMONGST SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES, WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON WOMEN AND YOUNG PEOPLE; AND B. RESEARCHING AND RAISING AWARENESS OF THE CAUSES OF POVERTY AND DEVELOPING AND PROMOTING MECHANISMS TO RELIEVE THE CAUSES; 2. TO PROMOTE RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ADVANCING KNOWLEDGE, MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND PEACEFUL RELATIONS BETWEEN DIFFERENT ETHNIC AND RELIGIOUS GROUPS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
70 BLAIRHEAD DRIVE
WATFORD
WD19 7RJ
- Phone:
- 02045417597
- Email:
- sophosafrica@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window