INTERNATIONAL HUMAN CARE AND RELIEF ORGANISATION UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing relief to the poor and those in need. In the form of water projects, food packs, and supporting those with medical needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kenya
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Niger
- Pakistan
- Turkey
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2024 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2024 | 365 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG POOR PEOPLE AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, WATER AND COSTS FOR MEDICAL TREATMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS; (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR, THE ILLITERATE AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES, EQUIPMENT, ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS SCHOOLS AND TRAINING CENTRES; (3) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ISLAMIC EDUCATION, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QURAN AND THE TEACHINGS OF PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PBUH) AS INTERPRETED AND ACCEPTED BY THE AHLE-SUNNAH WAL-JAMAA-AH SCHOOL OF THOUGHT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window