THE GUILD OF ENAMELLERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Guild runs enamelling workshops throughout the UK at which people can learn and practice enamelling techniques and develop their skills. On-line work shops at which enamelling methods are demonstrated are also run throughout the year. The Guild provides instructional DVDs and videos which give detailed demonstrations by well known experts in the field.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 October 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Anne Pearson | Trustee | 11 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Navah Langmeyer | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Bryony Gurney | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Phipps | Trustee | 18 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Zoe Slattery | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roselyn Ann Jones | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julia Anne Riddington | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jennifer Rowley | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.04k | £48.62k | £42.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.89k | £43.79k | £39.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 19 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 19 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
1) TO FURTHER THE PRESERVATION, SKILL, EXCELLENCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF CRAFTSMANSHIP IN VITREOUS ENAMELLING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, AND (2) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN SUCH CRAFTSMANSHIP
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 AVON WAY
LONDON
E18 2AR
- Phone:
- 07543648480
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window