Trustees THE GUILD OF ENAMELLERS
Charity Number: 1196237

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Anne Pearson | Trustee | 11 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Navah Langmeyer | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Bryony Gurney | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Phipps | Trustee | 18 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Zoe Slattery | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roselyn Ann Jones | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julia Anne Riddington | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jennifer Rowley | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.