SW15 MUSIC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SW15 Music provides free music tuition to people 6 - 18 years old and older if the person has special needs. The charity meets weekly at a Community Clubroom. The sessions include individual instrument music tuition on a range of instruments and encouragement to form bands and perform in public. SW15 Music facilitate ukulele workshops at national music festivals, schools and local library.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 12 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Edmund Philbert Stanislaus | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Arthur Paul Vincent | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rowshara Sheoli Parvin Zaman | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.04k | £2.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.22k | £3.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN MUSIC AND THE ARTS, AND ANCILLARY SUBJECTS SUCH AS SOUND ENGINEERING AND PERFORMANCE SKILLS, IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND THOSE WHOM THE TRUSTEES BELIEVE WOULD BENEFIT FROM BEING GIVEN GREATER ACCESS TO MUSIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Community Clubroom
Toland Square
Roehampton
London
SW15 5PA
- Phone:
- 07977556062
- Email:
- SW15Music@hotmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window