CRAWLEY CAP CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Crawley CAP Centre works in partnership with local churches and with the national charity, Christians Against Poverty (CAP). The Centre provides a high quality debt counselling service in association with the national CAP charity, helping clients to become debt free. We offer a CAP Money Course to develop budgeting skills, and we may develop further CAP services over time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
62 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- West Sussex
Governance
- 15 February 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Dobson | Chair | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Ruth Wilson | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
PETER IONS | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Cruickshank | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JAMES PUDNEY | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.86k | £72.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.14k | £51.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: A. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR PERSONS LIVING IN AND AROUND CRAWLEY WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES BY PROVIDING AND PROMOTING THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND OTHER SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; B. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC LIVING IN AND AROUND CRAWLEY IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE MANAGEMENT OF THEIR PERSONAL FINANCES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND C. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND DOCTRINE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN AND AROUND CRAWLEY AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Elim Church
Trinity Centre
The Mardens
Crawley
West Sussex
RH11 0AQ
- Phone:
- 07749938443
- Email:
- racheldawson@capuk.org
- Website:
-
crawleycapcentre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window