Financial history IN2VENTURE

Charity number: 518891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.38k £20.37k £20.81k £58.67k £35.12k
Total expenditure £25.46k £14.01k £35.41k £33.35k £59.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A