The Lindisfarne Centre for the Study of Christian Persecution

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity undertakes research on persecution of Christians around the world
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 August 2023: CIO registration
- THE LINDISFARNE RESEARCH CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID CHARLWOOD | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS MARTIN | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Martin David Parsons | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £494 | |
|
Total expenditure | £234 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Aug 2023 as amended on 16 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 4.1 TO PROMOTE FUNDAMENTAL HUMAN RIGHTS (IN PARTICULAR, THOSE RELATING TO FREEDOM OF RELIGION OR BELIEF AND FREEDOM OF SPEECH) EXEMPLIFIED IN: • THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS, 1948 • THE INTERNATIONAL COVENANT ON CIVIL AND POLITICAL RIGHTS, 1966 • THE UN DECLARATION ON THE ELIMINATION OF ALL FORMS OF INTOLERANCE OR DISCRIMINATION BASED ON RELIGION OR BELIEF, 1981) OF THE CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY, BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: • MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS • OBTAINING REDRESS FOR HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSES • RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES • EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS • RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES • PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS • PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS • INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE PURPOSES THE CIO WILL ANALYSE, RAISE AWARENESS AND PROMOTE UNDERSTANDING OF RELIGIOUS PERSECUTION AS IT RELATES TO THE CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY AROUND THE WORLD. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THEY ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CIO TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CIO CARRIES OUT ITS OBJECTS. 4.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY SUPPORTING CHRISTIANS IN THE PRACTICE OF THEIR FAITH BY UNDERTAKING RESEARCH AND EDUCATING THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN RELATION TO THE PERSECUTION OF CHRISTIANS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, INCLUDING PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF RESEARCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 STATION ROAD
POLEGATE
EAST SUSSEX
BN26 6EA
- Phone:
- 07980131576
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window