PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL ST CATHARINE’S, HOUGHTON.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
See original statements on application form number 5188920, nothing has changed
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 12 November 2021: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Steven Ransley | Chair | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JOHN RICHARDSON | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Jackson | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Welsh | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Shaw | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Evans | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Ethel Oldham BA Hons MA | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard William Barclay Morrison | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.99k | £92.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.78k | £111.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 September 2024 | 312 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 September 2024 | 312 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Main Street
Houghton-on-the-Hill
Leicester
LE7 9GD
- Phone:
- 01162416895
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window