CLOTHING COVENTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing seasonal appropriate clothes to people in poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £15,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
52 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
Governance
- 22 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Antony Wilson | Chair | 22 December 2021 |
|
|||||||
Isabelle Edgar-McCabe | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|||||||
Natasha Leese | Trustee | 22 December 2021 |
|
|||||||
David Budd | Trustee | 22 December 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.37k | £170.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.10k | £93.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN COVENTRY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF DONATED CLOTHING TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clothing Coventry
19 NAPIER STREET
COVENTRY
CV1 5PR
- Phone:
- 07704044230
- Email:
- admin@clothingcoventry.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window